Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Isnardo Tacconi, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thebae

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateEventTitle
1308¹AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
12 Jul 1308Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
4 Aug 1311AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
5 Aug 1311AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
1320¹ResignedBishop of Pavia, Italy
29 May 1326AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
1342¹DiedTitular Archbishop of Thebae

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isnardo Tacconi
Patriarch Isnardo Tacconi O.P. (died 1342) Titular Archbishop of Thebae

  • a bishop for 33.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 482, and Page 389
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast