Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop István Szuhay

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1551Born
6 Jun 159443.3AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
159543.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
23 Oct 160049.7AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
160149.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Esztergom, Hungary
160755.9AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
5 Oct 160756.6AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
9 Jun 160857.3DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Szuhay (VIAF: 291598073)
Archbishop István Szuhay (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuchá nad Parnou

  • a bishop for 13.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 73, and Page 356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 325
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast