Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ryszard Szmydki, O.M.I.

Under Secretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1951 Born
21 Jan 197725.7Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 Jul 197827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
28 Sep 201766.4AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

MicroData Summary for Ryszard Szmydki (VIAF: 164390852)
Father Ryszard Szmydki O.M.I. (born ) Under Secretary of Evangelization of Peoples

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarebiski, Poland

Please contact the Father through the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Jan 2019

Quantcast