Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Smolianović (Szmolianovich)

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornBoccari
9 Sep 166533.7SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
22 Aug 166735.6ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
5 Feb 166836.1Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
1677¹45.0DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan Smolianović (Szmolianovich):
Bishop Ivan Smolianović (Szmolianovich) , Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 349
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 309
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013