Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pál Széchényi, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1645Born
12 Dec 167631.4SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
18 Apr 167832.8ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
24 Nov 168742.4AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
9 Apr 169650.7SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
1 Jul 169752.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
22 May 171064.9DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Pál Széchényi
Archbishop Pál Széchényi O.S.P.P.E. (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGyongyos

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164, and Page 326
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018