Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Jan Szczuka

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹Born
11 Jul 167047.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Poland
13 Jul 167047.5Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
2 Oct 169370.7SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
5 Oct 169370.7ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
22 Nov 169370.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
18 Feb 169471.1InstalledBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Jun 169471.4DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Jan Szczuka
Bishop Kazimierz Jan Szczuka (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePłock

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,957
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018