Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Szczepanowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1030Born
107241.4AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
11 Apr 107948.7DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland
17 Sep 1253Canonized

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Szczepanowski
Bishop Stanisław Szczepanowski (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzczepanów

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018