Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Sylvius, O.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1590³Born
16 Jun 161222.2Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
19 Apr 163848.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
19 Apr 163848.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
May 1638²48.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
Dec 1640²50.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri Sylvius
Bishop Henri Sylvius O.S.C. (born , died Dec 1640) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiège

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 175
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast