Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Richard Sykes, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Zambese


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1854²BornHackin Hall, Whalley, Lancashire, Great Britain
1874²20.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
25 Sep 188733.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1896²42.0AppointedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
1904²50.0ResignedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
9 Mar 191561.1AppointedPrefect of Zambese, Zimbabwe
Dec 1919³65.9ResignedPrefect of Zambese, Zimbabwe
8 May 192066.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Zambese, Zimbabwe

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Sykes
Father Richard Sykes S.J. (born 1854, died ) Prefect Emeritus of Zambese

  • a priest for 32.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: CB, 22 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016