Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakub Świnka

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1283AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
18 Dec 1283Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 1283Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
4 Mar 1313DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jakub Świnka
Archbishop Jakub Świnka (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Kalisz
Death PlaceUniejów

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 Jun 2019

Quantcast