Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Sanvítores de la Portilla, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580²BornBurgos
28 Oct 165171.8AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
1 Sep 165373.6AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Oct 165878.7SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
27 Jan 165979.0ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
14 Jul 166080.5DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Sanvítores de la Portilla:
Bishop Alfonso de Sanvítores de la Portilla O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Zamora

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 79, and Page 104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 181, Number 1,126
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 27 Mar 2015