Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Susanna

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1633BornSanta Severina
1 Apr 165623.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 168451.0AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
Nov 1705³72.6DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Susanna:
Bishop Fabrizio Susanna (born , died Nov 1705) Bishop of Montepeloso

  • a priest for 49.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015