Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Braulio Sunyer

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornPobla de Massaluca
5 Aug 165848.6SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
5 Jan 166353.0ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
Jun 1663³53.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
7 Jun 166454.4InstalledBishop of Vic, Spain
24 Nov 166454.9AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
21 Sep 166757.7DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Braulio Sunyer:
Bishop Braulio Sunyer (died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 367, and Page 208
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 196, Number 1,229
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 74, Number 435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013