Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Suárez Maldonado

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jul 1525AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
20 Mar 1532AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
18 Sep 1545DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Suárez Maldonado
Bishop Jerónimo Suárez Maldonado (died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 245
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 39, Number 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast