Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michel Sudres, C.S.V. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Clerics of Saint Viator


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1897¹Born
1909²12.0EnteredMember of Clerics of Saint Viator
27 Jun 195760.4AppointedSuperior General of Clerics of Saint Viator
27 Jun 1967²70.4CeasedSuperior General of Clerics of Saint Viator
20 May 198588.3DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Clerics of Saint Viator

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Sudres (VIAF: 310657579)
Father Michel Sudres C.S.V. (born 1897, died ) Superior General Emeritus of Clerics of Saint Viator

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrance
Death PlaceTreize-Pierres, France

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast