Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Suárez Carvajal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485¹Born
9 Sep 153954.6AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
10 Mar 156176.1RetiredBishop of Lugo, Spain
6 Oct 158499.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lugo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Suárez Carvajal
Bishop Juan Suárez Carvajal (born 1485, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalavera de la Reina, Archdiocese of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 51, Number 273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018