Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matija Juraj Įtukanović

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1682¹BornPerast
17 Jun 171331.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
Aug 1713²31.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
1 Jun 172240.4AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
13 Dec 174563.9DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matija Juraj Įtukanović
Archbishop Matija Juraj Įtukanović (born 1682, died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88, and Page 129
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 37
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,879
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016