Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Strzelecki

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateEventTitle
9 May 1481AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
20 May 1481Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
26 Aug 1488DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Strzelecki
Archbishop Jan Strzelecki (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Bernard prope Columnam Montium, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast