Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop August Franz von Strauß (Strauss)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Samaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1737BornMainz
1 Mar 176123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
1 Jun 177840.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
1 Jun 177840.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
22 Nov 177841.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
26 Sep 178245.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for August Franz von Strauß (Strauss):
Bishop August Franz von Strauß (Strauss) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015