Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Stoltevoth

Deceased

Bishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1475AppointedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
16 Jul 1475Ordained BishopBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
29 Jul 1477³DiedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan Stoltevoth
Bishop Ivan Stoltevoth (died ) Bishop of Reval (Rewel)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHospice Teutonique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 223
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1475, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast