Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Stolpmann

Deceased

Bishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Sep 1417SelectedBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
30 Jan 1418Ordained BishopBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
9 May 1418ConfirmedBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
22 Jul 1427DiedBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Stolpmann
Bishop Gerhard Stolpmann (died ) Bishop of Pomesania (Pomezania)

  • a bishop for 9.4 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,109
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018