Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Simon Ambros Stock

Deceased

Titular Bishop of the Titular See

Titular See: Rosone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1710BornWien
6 Dec 173222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
20 Mar 177060.2AppointedTitular Bishop of the Titular See
22 Dec 177262.9DiedTitular Bishop of the Titular See

MicroData Summary for Simon Ambros Stock:
Father Simon Ambros Stock (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Titular See

  • a priest for 40.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015