Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Augustin Stöckli, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1857Born
1884²26.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
2 Dec 189538.0AppointedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
24 Sep 190244.8DiedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Stöckli (VIAF: 304397008)
Abbot Augustin Stöckli O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuswil
Death PlaceEschenbach

  • a priest for 18.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017