Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cesaire Stern, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Weihai [Weihaiwei]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1877BornWillgottheim, France
189820.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Aug 190426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Jun 193961.5AppointedPrefect of Weihai [Weihaiwei], China
28 Mar 194971.3ResignedPrefect of Weihai [Weihaiwei], China
5 Nov 195779.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Weihai [Weihaiwei], China

MicroData Summary for Cesaire Stern:
Priest Cesaire Stern O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Weihai [Weihaiwei]

  • a priest for 53.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013