Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albrecht von Sternberg

Deceased

Bishop of Litomyšl, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1333¹Born
19 Oct 135623.7AppointedBishop of Schwerin, Germany
23 Aug 136431.6AppointedBishop of Litomyšl, Czech Republic
9 Jun 136835.4AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
13 Oct 137138.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Litomyšl, Czech Republic
14 Jan 138047.0DiedBishop of Litomyšl, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albrecht von Sternberg (VIAF: 85668579)
Archbishop Albrecht von Sternberg (born 1333, died ) Bishop of Litomyšl

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 321, and Page 539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast