Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andreas Cardinal Steinhuber, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1824BornUttlau, Germany
16 Jan 189368.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
18 May 189469.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189469.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
12 Dec 189571.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
1 Oct 189671.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
15 Oct 190782.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index

MicroData Summary for Andreas Steinhuber:
Cardinal Andreas Steinhuber S.J. (born , died ) Prefect of Index

  • a cardinal for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013