Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulo a Santo Tomas de Aquino, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1772¹Born
5 Jun 181947.4SelectedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
17 Dec 181947.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
4 Mar 182149.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
19 Dec 182351.9DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paulo a Santo Tomas de Aquino
Archbishop Paulo a Santo Tomas de Aquino O.P. (born 1772, died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 166
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1,821, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast