Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Ignaz (Josef Thomas) Staub, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1872Born
8 Sep 189320.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Jul 189926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Dec 192351.0SelectedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
29 Dec 192351.0ConfirmedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
28 Jan 192451.1InstalledAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
29 Mar 194774.2DiedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Ignaz (Josef Thomas) Staub (VIAF: 10854394)
Abbot Ignaz (Josef Thomas) Staub O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMenzingen
Death PlaceEinsiedeln, Territorial Abbey of Maria Einsiedeln

  • a priest for 47.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast