Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Staroźrebski Sobiejuski

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517Born
6 Nov 156245.8AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
11 Dec 157760.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1 Jan 158063.0DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Staroźrebski Sobiejuski
Bishop Wojciech Staroźrebski Sobiejuski (born 1517, died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 164, and Page 280
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,562, Number 34*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast