Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Maximus Stainer von Pleinfelden

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Titular Bishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornBamberg
164838.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 168272.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
7 Dec 168272.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selymbria
14 Mar 168373.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selymbria
15 Oct 169282.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Maximus Stainer von Pleinfelden:
Bishop Johannes Maximus Stainer von Pleinfelden (born 1610, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 352
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015