Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Maria Spínola, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
17 Dec 165739.9AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
20 Jan 165840.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
5 Aug 165840.5DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Maria Spínola
Bishop Paolo Maria Spínola C.R.S. (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for .5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 1
  • d: CB, 20 Oct 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018