Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Spada, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1867Born
1892²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1924²56.0AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
1926²58.0ResignedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
25 Nov 195082.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Spada
Father Giovanni Spada P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, Diocese of Marseille, France
Death PlaceHong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

  • a priest for 58.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast