Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Sousa

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornLisboa
19 Jan 167161.0AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
5 Jul 167161.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
23 Jan 167868.0DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Sousa:
Archbishop Diego de Sousa (died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a bishop for 6.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 192
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,681
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 181
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015