Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Sousa (Souza) Saraiva, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Peking [Beijing], China

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1764³Born
1780¹15.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
22 Dec 178723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
20 Aug 180439.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China
20 Aug 180439.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
13 Oct 180540.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
6 Jul 180843.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China
18 Feb 181853.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Sousa (Souza) Saraiva
Bishop Joaquim Sousa (Souza) Saraiva C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Peking [Beijing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamalhotes, Diocese of Leiria, Portugal
Ordained BishopMacau, Diocese of Macau
Death PlaceMacau, Diocese of Macau

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,805, Number 32
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 301, and Page 371
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast