Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Emmanuel de Sousa Carvalho, M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Beja, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1750Born
18 Sep 177322.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 177524.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 181463.5SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
19 Dec 181463.9ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
1815²64.0DiedBishop-Elect of Beja, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel de Sousa Carvalho
Father Emmanuel de Sousa Carvalho M.I. (born , died 1815) Bishop-Elect of Beja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Nova de Gaya

  • a priest for 39.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 107
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1814

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast