Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorius Sorger

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1687¹Born
3 Jul 172740.5SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
8 Mar 172841.1ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
25 Feb 172942.1SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
7 Sep 172942.6ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
1739¹52.0DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorius Sorger
Bishop Gregorius Sorger (born 1687, died 1739) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbaura

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 381, and Page 386
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018