Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Surgenti (Sorgente), C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1638AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
9 Jan 1640AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Monopoli, Italy
13 Oct 1651DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Surgenti (Sorgente):
Archbishop Francesco Surgenti (Sorgente) C.R. (died ) Bishop of Monopoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 122, and Page 246
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013