Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felice Sollazzo Castriotta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bisignano

Titular Archbishop of the Titular See

Note/Previous Titular See: Thebarum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1680BornRossano
21 May 170524.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 172140.7AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
18 Jun 174564.6ResignedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
21 Jun 174564.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of the Titular See
9 Mar 175574.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Sollazzo Castriotta:
Archbishop Felice Sollazzo Castriotta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bisignano

  • a priest for 49.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1744
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013