Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco da Soledade Bravo

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1768³Born
23 Apr 179123.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 183163.4SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
24 Feb 183263.8ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
10 Jun 183264.1Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
21 Jun 183264.1InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
10 Nov 183365.5DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Francisco da Soledade Bravo
Bishop José Francisco da Soledade Bravo (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerpa

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018