Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Brandão de Sousa, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pinhel, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1767Born
16 Mar 179325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
7 Apr 183264.4SelectedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
17 Dec 183265.1ConfirmedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
10 Feb 183365.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
19 Apr 183870.5DiedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Brandão de Sousa
Bishop Leonardo Brandão de Sousa C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Pinhel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVinhó de Souto

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 307
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018