Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António (de Santa Maria) Lencastre, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546²BornSetubal
8 Feb 161670.1AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
16 May 162377.3DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António (de Santa Maria) Lencastre:
Bishop António (de Santa Maria) Lencastre O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Leiria

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015