Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antoon-Everhard Smorenburg, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mongolia, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1827Born
17 Aug 185124.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 185225.9ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1867²39.9ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
5 Apr 186942.2AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
8 Dec 187043.9ResignedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
1 Jan 190476.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mongolia, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoon-Everhard Smorenburg
Father Antoon-Everhard Smorenburg C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mongolia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoestdijk, Netherlands
Death PlaceWijk-bij-Duurstede, Netherlands

  • a priest for 52.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast