Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johannes Walter Cardinal Sluse

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1628BornVisť, Belgium
2 Sep 168658.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168658.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
16 Jul 168759.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

MicroData Summary for Johannes Walter Sluse:
Johannes Walter Cardinal Sluse (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

  • a cardinal for .8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015