Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franciszek Ślusarczyk

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1958 Born
20 May 198425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
3 Dec 201860.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
3 Dec 201860.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cillium
12 Dec 2018³60.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
12 Dec 2018³60.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Cillium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Ślusarczyk
Father Franciszek Ślusarczyk (born ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kraków {Cracow}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDobczyce, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2018
  • ob/c12: CB, 3 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Jan 2019

Quantcast