Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Słomowski (Szbomowski)

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1560AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Krakˇw, Poland
14 Feb 1560AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
7 Sep 1565AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
22 Sep 1575DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Słomowski (Szbomowski)
Archbishop Stanisław Słomowski (Szbomowski) (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 218, and Page 223
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,560, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast