Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de São José de Castro, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1745³BornLisboa
3 Dec 177530.5Ordained PriestPriest of Carthusian Order
11 Aug 179853.2SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
13 Nov 179853.5ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
12 Apr 181468.9DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António de São José de Castro
Bishop António de São José de Castro O. Cart. (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 38.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 346
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016