Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Sirleto

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1603AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
20 Apr 1603Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
1 Apr 1635DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Sirleto:
Bishop Fabrizio Sirleto (died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a bishop for 31.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 321
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015