Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Simonetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1789Born
22 Jul 184455.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
24 Nov 184556.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
24 Nov 184556.4Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 185565.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Simonetti
Lorenzo Cardinal Simonetti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 10.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018