Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Venantius Simi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sabina, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Salamis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1641Born
21 Jun 166523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Jul 166524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Mar 170563.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
2 Mar 170563.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Salamis
18 Nov 171271.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
2 May 171876.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sabina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Venantius Simi
Archbishop Venantius Simi O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenzano

  • a priest for 52.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 340
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast