Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Simeoni (Menecussis), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1552AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
3 Jul 1553AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
2 Sep 1556DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Simeoni (Menecussis)
Bishop Antonio Simeoni (Menecussis) O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 246, and Page 306
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018